NM SB145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Info Interoperability Fund
Title
Health Info Interoperability Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (64-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 9] HHouse Health |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 9] HHouse Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (28-8) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |