NM SB144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Intimidation Of Election Workers
Title
Intimidation Of Election Workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:30 |
2022-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2022-02-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-08 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2022-02-05 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SJC/SFC |