NM SB144 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Rename "breakfast After The Bell Program"
Title
Rename "breakfast After The Bell Program"
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 26 |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Passed House (61-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Education |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Assigned to House Education and then to House Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Passed Senate (40-1) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Committee substitute and then to Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Education |