NM SB143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 66 - Mar. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 66 - Mar. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prc Fire Safety Standards
Title
Prc Fire Safety Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 66 - Mar. 27 |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-28 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HSEIC |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:5 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-01 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |