NM SB14 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (35-23) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (35-23) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health care work force data collection
Title
Health care work force data collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] PASSED/H (35-23) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.152. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP | |
2011-02-19 | [LD 33] DP-HBIC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] HHGAC/HBIC-HHGAC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] PASSED/S (25-14) | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] DP | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP/a-SCORC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPAC/SCORC-SPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |