NM SB137 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Athlete Brain Injury Protocols
Title
Student Athlete Brain Injury Protocols
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 53 |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Passed House (63-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Health |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Passed Senate (35-4) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |