NM SB135 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Charter Schools In School Districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter Schools In School Districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-28Senate[LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 78
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Passed House (68-0)
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-25House[LD 9] Referred to House Education
2017-01-25House[LD 9] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance
2017-02-03Senate[LD 18] Passed Senate (32-9)
2017-02-01Senate[LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-25Senate[LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-01-25Senate[LD 9] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-25Senate[LD 9] Do not pass committee report adopted
2017-01-18Senate[LD 2] Referred to Senate Education
2017-01-18Senate[LD 2] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback