NM SB132 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student Loan Repayment For Some Students
Title
Student Loan Repayment For Some Students
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Education |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Assigned to House Education and then to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (37-2) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |