NM SB131 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 98 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 98 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public School Funding Changes
Title
Public School Funding Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 98 - Apr. 4 |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:50 N:0 |
2023-03-10 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-27 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-20 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |