NM SB128 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (54-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (54-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public school capital outlay building needs
Title
Public school capital outlay building needs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (54-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 93. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] HWMC |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Referred to House Education |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Assigned to House Education and then to HWMC |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |