NM SB123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed House (53-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 2) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed House (53-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 2) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify livestock definition
Title
Clarify livestock definition
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Passed House (53-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 2) Ch. 22. |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HAWC |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HAWC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |