NM SB122 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 38 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 38 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distributions To Judicial Retirement Funds
Title
Distributions To Judicial Retirement Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 38 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:3 |
2020-02-17 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-13 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-08 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SFC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |