NM SB12 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 2 - Feb. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 2 - Feb. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ag Office For Missing Indigenous Persons
Title
Ag Office For Missing Indigenous Persons
Sponsors
Sen. Siah Correa Hemphill [D] | Rep. Pamelya Herndon [D] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Sen. Shannon Pinto [D] |
Sen. Nancy Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Antoinette Sedillo Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 2 - Feb. 24 |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2022-02-14 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2022-02-13 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2022-01-26 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SJC/SFC |