NM SB118 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Dwi Penalties
Title
Increase Dwi Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 16 |
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Passed House (53-12) |
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-06 | House | [LD 19] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (34-2) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-22 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |