NM SB115 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute care review board administration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute care review board administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-26Senate[LD 48] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
2015-03-17House[LD 41] Passed House (66-1)
2015-03-17House[LD 41] Floor amendment adopted
2015-03-16House[LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-05House[LD 33] Referred to House Judiciary
2015-03-05House[LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-05House[LD 13] HHC
2015-02-05House[LD 13] HHC and then to House Judiciary
2015-01-27Senate[LD 6] Passed Senate (38-0)
2015-01-27Senate[LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-26Senate[LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2015-01-26Senate[LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-26Senate[LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted
2015-01-22Senate[LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2015-01-22Senate[LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary
2015-01-20Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback