NM SB111 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hire Of Nm Licensed Surveyor And Attorney

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hire Of Nm Licensed Surveyor And Attorney

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseHLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-03HouseSent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HAFC
2021-03-03SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:30 N:8
2021-03-01SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2021-02-10SenateSIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-01-19SenateSent to SIRC - Referrals: SIRC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback