NM SB111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 10 - Mar. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 10 - Mar. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes To Educational Retirement
Title
Changes To Educational Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 10 - Mar. 2 |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:2 |
2020-02-17 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-12 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:7 |
2020-02-08 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-04 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SEC/SFC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |