NM SB105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (67-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (67-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County gross receipts for school improvements
Title
County gross receipts for school improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Passed House (67-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] HWMC |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] HGEIC |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] HGEIC and then to HWMC |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Passed Senate (27-13) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |