NM SB103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Of College Credits
Title
Transfer Of College Credits
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 18 |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (68-1) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] HSIVC |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] HSIVC and then to House Education |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Education |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |