NM SB1 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 45 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wholesale Prescription Drug Importation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wholesale Prescription Drug Importation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 45 - Mar. 4
2020-02-17HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0
2020-02-12HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-08HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-05HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC
2020-02-04SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0
2020-02-03SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-27SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-22SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-21SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SFC
2020-01-21SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback