NM SB1 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - [LD 4] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 1(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Severance Tax Bond Project Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Severance Tax Bond Project Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27Senate[LD 4] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 1(partial veto).
2017-05-26House[LD 3] Passed House (64-0)
2017-05-25House[LD 2] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-05-25House[LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-05-25House[LD 2] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2017-05-26Senate[LD 3] Passed Senate (38-3)
2017-05-25Senate[LD 2] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2017-05-25Senate[LD 2] Do not pass committee report adopted
2017-05-24Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Finance
2017-05-24Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback