NM SB1 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Mortgage fair foreclosures act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage fair foreclosures act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2012-01-20 [LD 4] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted
2012-01-18 [LD 2] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2012-01-18 [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback