NM HM8 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-08 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-08 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
"congenital Heart Disease Awareness Week"
Title
"congenital Heart Disease Awareness Week"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2022-02-07 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2022-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2022-01-20 | House | Not Printed, Not referred to committee, tabled |
2022-01-18 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |