NM HM65 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - [LD 36] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - [LD 36] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Watershed health planning & management
Title
Watershed health planning & management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | [LD 36] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (62-0) |
2013-03-04 | House | [LD 35] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |