NM HM6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - [LD 6] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - [LD 6] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
50th Anniversary Balloon Fiesta Stamp
Title
50th Anniversary Balloon Fiesta Stamp
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 6] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (67-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] HLELC |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] HLELC |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |