NM HM6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - [LD 25] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - [LD 25] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
College students as 3rd grade reading mentors
Title
College students as 3rd grade reading mentors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Passed House (45-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Education |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] Printed |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Not Referred to Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |