NM HM111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Runaway child & family protective services
Title
Runaway child & family protective services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | [LD 46] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-24 | Senate | [LD 46] |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Passed House (49-0) |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HSCAC |