NM HM1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regional Water Planning Process Improvements
Title
Regional Water Planning Process Improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Signed by one or both houses |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (44-0) |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Committee substitute and then to WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |