NM HM1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - [LD 14] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - [LD 14] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
"support the alliance of ymca day"
Title
"support the alliance of ymca day"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] SGND. | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] w/drn - PASSED/H (70-0) | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] nt prntd-nt ref com-tbld | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |