NM HJR9 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (35-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Roswell Land Sale

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Roswell Land Sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14Senate[LD 19] Passed Senate (35-0)
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Passed House (61-0)
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-07House[LD 5] Referred to House Judiciary
2018-02-07House[LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2018-01-31House[LD 4] HLELC
2018-01-31House[LD 4] HLELC and then to House Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback