NM HJM9 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Border security liaison
Title
Border security liaison
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP-SJC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] SRC/SJC-SRC | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] PASSED/H (53-0) | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] DP | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HHGAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |