NM HJM3 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Violence & Family Violence Training
Title
Animal Violence & Family Violence Training
Sponsors
Rep. James Dines [R] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Passed House (55-0) |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |