NM HJM2 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Career Technical Education Task Force
Title
Career Technical Education Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2020-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2020-02-08 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-31 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |