NM HJM15 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study pre-booking diversion program
Title
Study pre-booking diversion program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (48-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |