NM HJM1 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"better hearing & speech month"
Title
"better hearing & speech month"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to S |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (70-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to H |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |