NM HJM1 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study school district administration reforms
Title
Study school district administration reforms
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Education | |
2012-02-01 | [LD 12] Passed House (63-0) | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Education | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=1&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM001.pdf |