NM HB93 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limit Out-of-school Suspensions
Title
Limit Out-of-school Suspensions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SJC |
2021-03-01 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:54 N:12 |
2021-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-02-11 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-02 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |