NM HB93 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 17 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 17 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Efficient Use Of Energy Act Changes
Title
Efficient Use Of Energy Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 17 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2020-02-15 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2020-02-06 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-31 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-22 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HJC |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |