NM HB90 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elizabeth Whitefield End Of Life Options Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elizabeth Whitefield End Of Life Options Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-02-27Housetabled temporarily by motion in House
2019-02-14HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-01-29HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-16HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC
2019-01-15HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback