NM HB90 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - [LD 11] Referred to Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - [LD 11] Referred to Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Border & Port Authority
Title
Border & Port Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (37-25) |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] fl and then to sub adptd |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HLEDC |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HSIVC |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HSIVC and then to HLEDC |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |