NM HB9 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 5 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unlawful Access To Firearm By Minor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Access To Firearm By Minor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 5 - Mar. 14
2023-03-08HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2023-03-03SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:24 N:16
2023-03-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2023-03-02SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-02-28SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2023-02-10SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
2023-02-09HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:37 N:32
2023-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2023-01-31HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-01-25HouseHCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-01-18HouseSent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC
2023-01-17HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback