NM HB89 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 90 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 90 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy Soil Tax Refund Contribution Option
Title
Healthy Soil Tax Refund Contribution Option
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Armstrong [R] | Rep. Christine Chandler [D] | Rep. Jack Chatfield [R] | Rep. Nathan Small [D] |
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 90 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:1 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/STBTC |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2021-02-09 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HTRC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |