NM HB80 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid false claims act actions
Title
Medicaid false claims act actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Passed House (52-15) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-26 | [LD 8] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs | |
2012-01-26 | [LD 8] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary | |
2012-01-26 | [LD 8] Printed | |
2012-01-26 | [LD 8] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Not Printed |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=80&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/house/HB0080.pdf |