NM HB8 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 78 - Mar. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 78 - Mar. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electric Generating Facility Econ Districts
Title
Electric Generating Facility Econ Districts
Sponsors
Rep. Eliseo Alcon [D] | Rep. Harry Garcia [D] | Rep. Doreen Johnson [D] | Rep. Patricia Lundstrom [D] |
Rep. Joseph Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 78 - Mar. 9 |
2020-02-19 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-15 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC/SFC |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:55 N:9 |
2020-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2020-02-04 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-27 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-22 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HSEIC |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |