NM HB8 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.8) Ch. 79.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.8) Ch. 79.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Development training funds
Title
Development training funds
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Lujan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.8) Ch. 79. | |
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP/a | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP-SFC | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SCORC/SFC-SCORC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] DP | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HLC/HAFC-HLC |