NM HB78 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/fld recede- CC
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/fld recede- CC
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Driver's license and id card restrictions
Title
Driver's license and id card restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] s/fld recede- CC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] h/fld cncr | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] w/o rec/a - fl/aaa- PASSED/S (25-16) | |
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] SJC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/H (42-28) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] w/drn-HJC- w/drn - fl/sub adptd | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC |