NM HB7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal Abortion Ban
Title
Repeal Abortion Ban
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Armstrong [D] | Rep. Micaela Cadena [D] | Rep. Brian Egolf [D] | Rep. Joanne Ferrary [D] |
Rep. Georgene Louis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to: HRC |
2021-03-09 | House | Sent to HTBL |
2021-02-23 | House | tabled temporarily by motion in House |
2021-02-09 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-28 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-25 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=7&year=21 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/21%20Regular/bills/house/HB0007.pdf |