NM HB672 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Funding For Certain Schools
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Floor substitute adopted |
2019-03-01 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to: HAFC |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-14 | House | Not Printed |