NM HB66 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 4 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 4 - Feb. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mammogram Info Disclosure
Title
Mammogram Info Disclosure
Sponsors
Rep. Micaela Cadena [D] | Rep. Christine Chandler [D] | Rep. Natalie Figueroa [D] | Rep. Dayan Hochman-Vigil [D] |
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Thomson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 4 - Feb. 4 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2019-01-22 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |