NM HB650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Failed to Pass in House, Bill has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Failed to Pass in House, Bill has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lower Gaming Tax On Certain Licenses
Title
Lower Gaming Tax On Certain Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Failed to Pass in House, Bill has Died |
2019-03-09 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-26 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HTRC |